User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:32, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+521) . . N Belfour, John Daniel (Created page with "Died 1805-7-17. (Memoirer & Breve 2:36) English Captain and merchant (Memoirer & Breve 2:36) '''Timeline'''<br /> 1787 - Citizenship in Elsinore. (Memoirer & Breve 2:36) 17...") (current)
- 14:15, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Haas, von (current)
- 14:14, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+199) . . N Haas, von (Created page with "1766 - Listed as ''Kammerherre'', ''Kommandeur-Kapitain'' and director of Afrikanske Kompagni. (Holck 1766:57) Category:MaleCategory:Naval OfficerCategory:Involved...")
- 14:11, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . m Borre, Peter (current)
- 14:07, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 14:05, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+85) . . m Blach, Oluf
- 14:03, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+251) . . N Rosenkrantz, Friderich Christian (Created page with "1766 - Listed as ''Ridder af Dannebroge'', ''Kammer=Herre'' and ''Ober Krigs=Sekretair'' as well as ''Præses'' in Almindeligt Handelskompagni. (Holck 1766:55) Category:Mal...") (current)
- 06:01, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+112) . . m Brown, John
- 04:45, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Melchior, Moses (current)
- 04:45, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 04:44, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 04:44, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+63) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 04:38, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:Mosesmelchior.JPG (current)
- 04:35, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 04:34, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 04:33, 23 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+255) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 08:47, 22 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 08:47, 22 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+546) . . m Melchior, Moses
- 06:16, 22 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 04:45, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+201) . . N Falck, Abraham (Created page with "''Viceborgmester'' of Copenhagen and Etatsraad. (Hof&Stat 1771) 1763-? - Director of Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof&Stat) Category: MaleCategory: EtatsraadCategory: Emplo...")
- 04:43, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+198) . . N Könnemann, Herman Hinrich (Created page with "Mayor of Copenhagen and Etatsraad. (Hof&Stat 1771) 1737-43 - Hovedparticipant in Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof&Stat) Category: Male Category: EtatsraadCategory: Involved...")
- 04:28, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-140) . . m Mandix, Hans Henrich
- 04:13, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . N Lehn, Abraham (Created page with "1702-1757 (PHT 1930:54) Father: Lehn, Abraham 2. (PHT 1930:54)")
- 04:10, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+96) . . m Friis, Johan Frederik
- 04:07, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Friis, Johan Frederik
- 04:04, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Edinger, Wilhelm
- 04:04, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+925) . . N Edinger, Wilhelm (Created page with "Born in Copenhagen in 1659, died in Copenhagen 1733-7-4. (PHT 1930:50) Family<br /> Father: Edinger, Johan Vilhelm (died 1667) (PHT 1930:48) Mother: Kriech, Elisabeth (d...")
- 03:53, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+49) . . m Edinger, Johannes
- 03:52, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+102) . . m Friis, Johan Frederik
- 03:51, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+287) . . m Edinger, Johannes
- 03:45, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+766) . . N Edinger, Johannes (Created page with "Born in Copenhagen in 1697, died in Copenhagen in 1763-1-19. (PHT 1930:53) '''Timeline'''<br /> Travelled abroad for seven years in his youth. (PHT 1930:53) 1732 - Appointed...")
- 03:26, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+306) . . m Friis, Johan Frederik
- 03:18, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,009) . . N Friis, Johan Frederik (Created page with "Born in Skamstrup in 1691 - died in Copenhagen 1767-5-2. (PHT 1930:55) '''Family'''<br /> Father: Friis, Peter Arrildsen, priest in Skamstrup-Frydendal. (PHT 1930:55) Mo...")
- 07:21, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 07:06, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 05:52, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+65) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 05:48, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+216) . . N Raff, Anthony (Created page with "'''Timeline'''<br /> 1747-? ''Hovedparticipant'' in Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof&Stat) Listed as ''Justitsraad'' and ''Viceborgmester''. (Hof&Stat 1750:52) Category:Male[...")
- 05:44, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+241) . . N Issenberg, Peter Johann (Created page with "Merchant (Hof & Stat 1750:52) Perhaps married to Issenberg, Madam? '''Timeline'''<br /> 1746- ''Hovedparticipant'' in Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof & Stat) Category:Mal...") (current)
- 03:31, 15 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . m Bynck, Samuel
- 02:40, 14 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Svane, Hans
- 02:40, 14 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Svane, Hans
- 07:01, 13 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+92) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy
- 17:45, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+193) . . N Søegaard, Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a glue factory outside Østerport. The products were sold from his house on Kultorvet.(Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:51) category:MaleC...") (current)
- 17:43, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+139) . . N Sveistrup, Niels (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a candle factory in Copenhagen. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:MaleCategory:Merchant") (current)
- 17:38, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+196) . . N Freese, Christian (Created page with "1766 - Listed as selling items from a ''Karte=Fabrik'' owned by the ''Issenkræmmer=Laug''. Resides in Nyegaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:Male...")
- 17:35, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+170) . . N Suhr, Johan Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as ''Raadmand'' and selling ''Høe=Leer og Skiereknive'' on Gammel Torv. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:MaleCategory:Merchant")
- 17:31, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+179) . . N Issenberg, Madam (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a ''Tapetserie= Bordug= og Kønrøgs=Fabrik'' in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:FemaleCategory:Factory Own...") (current)
- 17:26, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+181) . . N Ferslev (Created page with "1766 - Listed as Lotterie=Collecteur and as owning a tobbaco pipe factory in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory O...") (current)
- 17:06, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+180) . . N Meiting, Carl Leonhard (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a laquer factory on the corner of Store Regne=Gaden og Gammel Mynt. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory Ow...") (current)
- 17:05, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+145) . . N Hassing, Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a laquer factory in Silke=Gaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory Owner") (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)