User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 16:10, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+235) . . m Chevalier, Francois le
- 16:07, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+331) . . N Chevalier, Francois le (Created page with "Born 1770-2-12 in Amsterdam. (Werner, 1927, p. 54) '''Family'''<br /> Father: Chevalier, Rodolphe le Distantly related to the wife of Coninck, Frédéric de (Werner,...")
- 16:03, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . m House of Duntzfelt & Co
- 16:02, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Duntzfelt, Christian Wilhelm
- 16:00, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m House of Duntzfelt & Co
- 16:00, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Duntzfelt & Co (Created page with "Established in 1796 by Duntzfeldt, Christian Wilhelm after the dissolution of the House of Duntzfelt, Meyer & Co. (Werner 1927, p. 34)")
- 15:59, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+171) . . m Duntzfelt, Christian Wilhelm
- 15:47, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+914) . . m Duntzfelt, Christian Wilhelm
- 15:09, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+626) . . m Duntzfelt, Christian Wilhelm
- 14:59, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+210) . . N Duntzfelt, Christian Wilhelm (Created page with "Born 1762-9-8 in Negapatnam, close to Tranquebar. (Werner 1927, p. 7) '''Family'''<br /> Father: Düntzfeld, Johann Friedrich Mother: Kröckel, Anna Abigael Cate...")
- 07:19, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 07:14, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 06:50, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 05:58, 25 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy
- 05:10, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+87) . . m Fix, Johan Leonhard
- 04:26, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . m Fix, Johan Leonhard
- 04:26, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+196) . . N Fix, Johan Leonhard (Created page with "1736-1807 1767 - His name listed in the DAC Rollbooks as travelling to Trankebar and the Bengal onboard the DAC ship CRON PRINCEN AF DANEMARK. Listed as "bogholder", bookkeep...")
- 09:02, 26 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Rolighed (current)
- 09:02, 26 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+147) . . m Fabritius de Tengnagel, Conrad Alexander
- 09:00, 26 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+424) . . N Rolighed (Created page with "Country manor in Frederiksberg, just outside Copenhagen. 1749 - The land was owned by the merchant Stiefken, Lyder till his bankruptcy eight years later. ([http://plen.ku...")
- 15:32, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Sources & Litterature
- 15:32, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+166) . . m Sources & Litterature
- 13:32, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Klein, Hans Peder
- 13:32, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+379) . . N Klein, Hans Peder (Created page with "Citizenship in Copenhagen as captain. (Gøbel 2014) Timeline<br /> 1782-97 - Commanded a ship to the West Indies every year, a total of 16 voyages, first for Madtzen, Berte...")
- 13:27, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+366) . . N Madtzen, Bertel (Created page with "1751-1806 (Gøbel, 2014) Family<br /> Father: Madtzen, Lars '''Timeline'''<br /> 1774 - Captain of the MARGRETHE ELISABETH, owned by his father. (Gøbel, 2014) As a bat...") (current)
- 13:23, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+800) . . N Madtzen, Lars (Created page with "About 1720-1781 (Gøbel, 2014) '''Family'''<br /> Son: Madtzen, Bertel (Gøbel, 2014) '''Timeline'''<br /> 1745 - Citizenship of Copenhagen as a captain. (Gøbel, 2014)...") (current)
- 04:30, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+179) . . m House of Chippendale & Selbye
- 04:29, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+179) . . m House of C. Thalbitzer (current)
- 04:22, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+178) . . m House of Fabritius & Wever
- 04:21, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+176) . . m House of Ryberg, Thygesen & Co (current)
- 03:25, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Fabritius, Herman
- 03:25, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+171) . . m Fabritius, Herman
- 03:23, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:ElisabethMarieAbb.jpg (current)
- 03:18, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m House of Vick & Bruun (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Vick & Bruun to House of Vick & Bruun without leaving a redirect) (current)
- 03:17, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . N Reinhard Iselin & Co. (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Reinhard Iselin & Co. to House of Reinhard Iselin & Co.) (current)
- 03:17, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m House of Reinhard Iselin & Co. (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Reinhard Iselin & Co. to House of Reinhard Iselin & Co.)
- 03:16, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m House of Becker & Glerup (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Becker & Glerup to House of Becker & Glerup without leaving a redirect)
- 03:15, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . N Black & Co. (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Black & Co. to House of Black & Co.) (current)
- 03:15, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m House of Black & Co. (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Black & Co. to House of Black & Co.)
- 03:14, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+37) . . N Borre & Fenger (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Borre & Fenger to House of Borre & Fenger) (current)
- 03:14, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m House of Borre & Fenger (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Borre & Fenger to House of Borre & Fenger)
- 03:11, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of C. Thalbitzer (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House")
- 03:10, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of P. Tutein (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House") (current)
- 03:09, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Abraham Schneider (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House") (current)
- 03:08, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Ryberg, Thygesen & Co (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House")
- 03:06, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Morten Munck (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House") (current)
- 03:05, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Jens Lauritzen (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House") (current)
- 03:05, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Gustmeyer's Enke & Sønner (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House")
- 03:04, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+142) . . N House of Chippendale & Selbye (Created page with "Bought 5 shares á 100 rigsdaler in a new free harbour project in Copenhagen in 1771. (Schovelin 1900, 2, p. 106) Category:Merchant House")
- 03:04, 14 July 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+115) . . m House of de Coninck & Co
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)