User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 17:48, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . N Lindeman, Daniel (Created page with "1731-1736 - Part of the board of Sø-Assurance Kompagniet as ‘’Kommitteret ved policernes ekspedition”. Mentioned as ''Købmand''. (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-...") (current)
- 17:47, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 17:47, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . m Hemert, Joost van
- 17:46, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Könnemann, Herman Hinrich (current)
- 17:45, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . m Könnemann, Herman Hinrich
- 17:43, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . m Blach, Oluf (current)
- 17:42, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+120) . . m Severin, Jacob (current)
- 17:41, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . N Severin, Jacob (Created page with "1729-1731 - Part of the board of Sø-Assurance Kompagniet as ‘’Kommitteret ved policernes ekspedition”. Mentioned as ''Købmand''. (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-...")
- 17:40, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+222) . . m Klaumann, Gregorius Thellesen (current)
- 17:39, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+221) . . N Lassen, Jens (Created page with "1728-1729 - Part of the board of Sø-Assurance Kompagniet as ‘’Kommitteret ved policernes ekspedition”. Mentioned as ''Købmand''. (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-...") (current)
- 17:39, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Holmsted, Frederik
- 17:38, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+186) . . m Holmsted, Frederik
- 17:37, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+186) . . m Kløcker, Abraham
- 17:36, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . m Burmester, Nicolai (current)
- 17:36, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+209) . . N Burmester, Nicolai (Created page with "Part of the board of Sø-Assurance Kompagniet as ‘’Kommitteret ved policernes ekspedition”. Mentioned as ''Raadmand''. (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-1926:523) [...")
- 16:41, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . m Hooglant, Diederich (current)
- 16:40, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+363) . . N Hooglant, Diederich (Created page with "Died 1738 (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-1926:491) Youngest son: Hooglant, Simon (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-1926:491) 1726-4-25 - First meeting in ''S...")
- 16:33, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Holmsted, Frederik
- 16:33, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Edinger, Wilhelm
- 16:32, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Kløcker, Abraham
- 16:31, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . N Seckmann, Didrik (Created page with "1726-3-1 - Applied the king for permission to found Søassurancekompagniet in Copenhagen. (Thorsen: Sø-Assurance Kompagni 1726-1926:59) Category:Søassurancekompagniet")
- 16:31, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Soelberg, Hans Jørgen
- 16:30, 2 September 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Berregaard, Christian
- 09:05, 31 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+668) . . m Hansen, Otto Allewelt (current)
- 08:16, 31 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-14) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy
- 09:24, 15 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-169) . . m Keilgaard, Niels
- 09:20, 15 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+263) . . m Suhr, Johan Peter
- 07:58, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+208) . . m Bentley, Richard
- 05:55, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 04:48, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 04:44, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+208) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 04:28, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . m Vogelsang, Henrich Christian (current)
- 04:26, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+98) . . m Vogelsang, Henrich Christian
- 04:11, 11 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+113) . . N Bynck, Niels Hansen (Created page with "Son: Bynck, Samuel 1748-7-15 - Citizenship in Copenhagen as Skrædder. (Kbh Stadsarkiv, Borgerskabsregister)")
- 05:49, 10 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+70) . . m Hagerop, Christian (current)
- 05:48, 10 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+253) . . N Hagerop, Christian (Created page with "Captain in service of the VOC. Perhaps Danish? Lend money to the DAC in Canton in December 1759. (RA: Asiatisk Kompagni, Afdelingen i København: 1144: Negotieprotokol for...")
- 04:43, 9 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . m Main Page (Redirected page to Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy) (current)
- 03:49, 9 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy
- 03:49, 9 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Business Encyclopedia of the Oldenburg Monarchy to Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy)
- 03:49, 9 August 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+53) . . N Business Encyclopedia of the Oldenburg Monarchy (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Business Encyclopedia of the Oldenburg Monarchy to Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy) (current)
- 07:08, 23 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . m Muhle, Peter (current)
- 07:05, 23 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+322) . . N Muhle, Peter (Created page with "Born 1693, died 1749 (Mar. Mus of DK Image Archive) '''Timeline'''<br /> 1730 - Seconda Supercargo onboard the DAC ship CRONPRINTZ CHRISTIAN headed for Canton. (Diary of Tobi...")
- 02:51, 23 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-290) . . m Muhle, Herman (current)
- 10:05, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+82) . . m Bonsack, Joachim Severin
- 10:03, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+466) . . m Bonsack, Joachim Severin
- 08:49, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+224) . . m Lindencrone, Christian (current)
- 08:00, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+117) . . m Hurk, Pieter van
- 07:56, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+77) . . m Hurk, Pieter van
- 07:34, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (+114) . . m Hurk, Pieter van
- 07:04, 22 June 2017 (diff | hist) . . (-23) . . m Lawson, Tewis (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)