User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 03:45, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+766) . . N Edinger, Johannes (Created page with "Born in Copenhagen in 1697, died in Copenhagen in 1763-1-19. (PHT 1930:53) '''Timeline'''<br /> Travelled abroad for seven years in his youth. (PHT 1930:53) 1732 - Appointed...")
- 03:26, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+306) . . m Friis, Johan Frederik
- 03:18, 17 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,009) . . N Friis, Johan Frederik (Created page with "Born in Skamstrup in 1691 - died in Copenhagen 1767-5-2. (PHT 1930:55) '''Family'''<br /> Father: Friis, Peter Arrildsen, priest in Skamstrup-Frydendal. (PHT 1930:55) Mo...")
- 07:21, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 07:06, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 05:52, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+65) . . m Raff, Anthony
- 05:48, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+216) . . N Raff, Anthony (Created page with "'''Timeline'''<br /> 1747-? ''Hovedparticipant'' in Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof&Stat) Listed as ''Justitsraad'' and ''Viceborgmester''. (Hof&Stat 1750:52) Category:Male[...")
- 05:44, 16 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+241) . . N Issenberg, Peter Johann (Created page with "Merchant (Hof & Stat 1750:52) Perhaps married to Issenberg, Madam? '''Timeline'''<br /> 1746- ''Hovedparticipant'' in Asiatisk Kompagni. (Hof & Stat) Category:Mal...") (current)
- 03:31, 15 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . m Bynck, Samuel
- 02:40, 14 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Svane, Hans
- 02:40, 14 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Svane, Hans
- 07:01, 13 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+92) . . m Business Wiki of the Oldenburg Monarchy
- 17:45, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+193) . . N Søegaard, Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a glue factory outside Østerport. The products were sold from his house on Kultorvet.(Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:51) category:MaleC...") (current)
- 17:43, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+139) . . N Sveistrup, Niels (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a candle factory in Copenhagen. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:MaleCategory:Merchant") (current)
- 17:38, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+196) . . N Freese, Christian (Created page with "1766 - Listed as selling items from a ''Karte=Fabrik'' owned by the ''Issenkræmmer=Laug''. Resides in Nyegaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:Male...")
- 17:35, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+170) . . N Suhr, Johan Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as ''Raadmand'' and selling ''Høe=Leer og Skiereknive'' on Gammel Torv. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:MaleCategory:Merchant")
- 17:31, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+179) . . N Issenberg, Madam (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a ''Tapetserie= Bordug= og Kønrøgs=Fabrik'' in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:50) category:FemaleCategory:Factory Own...") (current)
- 17:26, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+181) . . N Ferslev (Created page with "1766 - Listed as Lotterie=Collecteur and as owning a tobbaco pipe factory in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory O...") (current)
- 17:06, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+180) . . N Meiting, Carl Leonhard (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a laquer factory on the corner of Store Regne=Gaden og Gammel Mynt. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory Ow...") (current)
- 17:05, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+145) . . N Hassing, Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a laquer factory in Silke=Gaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory Owner") (current)
- 17:04, 8 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+145) . . N Gasman, Friderik (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a laquer factory in Gammel Mynt. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Factory Owner")
- 16:42, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+185) . . N Wedige, Jens (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a ''Sæbe=Syderi'' on the corner of Store Regne Gaden and Gotters=Gaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:49) category:MaleCategory:Facto...")
- 16:39, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+237) . . N Thomsen, Alexander (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a ''Sæbe=Syderi'' on the corner of Printsens=Gaden in Christianshavn, called ''Det Kongelige Priviligerede Sæbe=Syderie''. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handel...") (current)
- 16:37, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+169) . . N Hansen, Hans Henrik (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a Sæbe=Syderi in Store Kongens Gaden in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:48) category:MaleCategory:Factory Owner") (current)
- 16:35, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-25) . . m Fenger, Peter
- 16:35, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-25) . . m Grønnegaard, Johannes (current)
- 16:34, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+190) . . N Grønnegaard, Johannes (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a Sæbe=Syderi in Langebroe=Gaden in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:48) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCategory:...")
- 16:32, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+173) . . m Fenger, Peter
- 16:30, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+171) . . N Steege, Knud (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Fiolstrædet. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCategory:Factory Owner") (current)
- 13:50, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+226) . . m Schimmelmann, Heinrich
- 13:47, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+323) . . N Schimmelmann, Heinrich (Created page with "'''Family'''<br /> Father: Schimmelmann, Diedrich Jacob, merchant (BioLek III) Mother: Ludendorff, Esther (BioLek III) '''Timeline'''<br /> 1766 - Listed as owning a...")
- 13:41, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+166) . . N Rømer, Ludvig Ferdinand (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Nyehavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCategory:Factory Owner")
- 13:40, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+181) . . N Reichardt (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Dronningens Bred=Gaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCategory:Factory O...") (current)
- 13:36, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+171) . . N Platfuss (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Nørre=Gaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCategory:Factory Owner") (current)
- 13:25, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . m Pelt, Abraham
- 13:24, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+155) . . m Pelt, Abraham
- 13:23, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+197) . . N Nygaard (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Vimmelskaftet with ''Interessenteres''. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:Sugar TraderCa...") (current)
- 13:22, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-25) . . m Kiøbke (current)
- 13:20, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+101) . . m Ladiges, Hinrich (current)
- 13:18, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+370) . . N Ladiges, Hinrich (Created page with "Born 1731-1-14 in Altona, died 1805-3-4 in Copenhagen. (BioLek III) 1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Snarregaden. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) Becam...")
- 13:13, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+201) . . N Kiøbke (Created page with "1766 - Listed as owning a sugar refinery in Viingaardstrædet. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:CommerceraadCategory:Sugar Trader...")
- 13:08, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+219) . . N Bortman, Peter (Created page with "1766 - Listed as ''Commerce=Raad'' and owning a sugar refinery in Christianshavn. (Holck: Dannemarcks Handels=Speil 1766:47) category:MaleCategory:CommerceraadCateg...")
- 12:52, 7 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+104) . . m Behagen, Gysbert
- 08:46, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+138) . . m Vogelsang, Frantz Wilhelm Otto
- 07:52, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+89) . . m Clasen, Adam Carl Andreas (current)
- 07:39, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-477) . . m Lassen, Peter
- 07:33, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+138) . . m Klitgaard, Gregers Jensen (current)
- 06:56, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+180) . . m Ruch, Peder
- 06:38, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+156) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 06:30, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+201) . . m Fix, Johan Leonhard
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)