User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 06:38, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+156) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 06:30, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+201) . . m Fix, Johan Leonhard
- 06:24, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+75) . . m Kall, Peter
- 06:20, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+387) . . m Kall, Peter
- 05:57, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Lynge, Hans Christian (current)
- 05:56, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+136) . . m Lynge, Hans Christian
- 05:08, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+104) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 05:00, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 03:53, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Hahr, Jakob (current)
- 03:53, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Hahr, Jakob (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Hahr to Hahr, Jakob without leaving a redirect)
- 03:53, 3 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon (current)
- 08:26, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 08:25, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 08:25, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+76) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 08:22, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+157) . . m Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand
- 08:20, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . m Hahr, Jakob
- 08:19, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+201) . . N Hahr, Jakob (Created page with "Sweidsh supercargo in Canton, involved with Ingsia in transactions with Mourier, Peter Poul Ferdinand at the time of Irgens death in 1774-8. (RA: DAC Copenhagen: Lette...")
- 08:17, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m Heyberg (current)
- 08:14, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon
- 08:14, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+460) . . N Heyberg (Created page with "Former ''Skibsassistent'' at DAC and in 1774 a private trader "på Kysterne og i Bengalen". Partnered with Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon and together they had a debt of 11916 t...")
- 08:11, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon
- 08:10, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+587) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon
- 07:58, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon
- 07:57, 2 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+136) . . m Irgens, Ferdinand Anthon
- 09:27, 23 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Kløcker, Abraham
- 07:40, 19 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-129) . . m Courtonne, Jaques Salomon
- 07:56, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+339) . . N Reiersen, Niels Lunde (Created page with "Born in 1742-02-16. (Nyrop 1896:14) '''Family'''<br /> Father: Reiersen, Peter, ''Bogholder'' at Det Kgl. Almindelige Handelsmagasin (Nyrop 1896:3) Mother: Lunde, Anna...")
- 05:38, 15 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . m Aggersborg, Jørgen
- 08:20, 29 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Falch, Svend Olsen (Benjamin Asmussen moved page Falch, Niels Olsen to Falch, Svend Olsen) (current)
- 08:18, 29 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+372) . . N Falch, Svend Olsen (Created page with "1691-11-19 - Citizenship in Copenhagen as captain. (Rådstueprotokol, Kbh. Stadsarkiv) 1692-5-29 - Posted a letter to Andersdatter, Ingeborg from Bayonne. The letter neve...")
- 09:41, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Plockross, Nicolai Andreas (current)
- 09:41, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+125) . . N Plockross, Nicolai Andreas (Created page with "1787 - Sekretær at Asiatisk Komapagni. (Klem, 1985, II:278) Category:MaleCategory:Employed at Asiatisk Kompagni")
- 09:36, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m Kisbye, Hans Canelius (current)
- 09:36, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+149) . . N Kisbye, Hans Canelius (Created page with "Born around 1760 (FT 1787) 1787 - '''Fuldmægtig''' at Asiatisk Kompagni. (FT 1787) Category:MaleCategory:Employed at Asiatisk Kompagni")
- 09:30, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+122) . . m Haste, Johan Henrik
- 09:28, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Schade, Ole Peter
- 09:28, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+176) . . m Schade, Ole Peter
- 09:24, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+208) . . m Haste, Johan Henrik
- 09:20, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+432) . . m Haste, Johan Henrik
- 09:20, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . N File:Hasteskive.JPG (Photo: Maritime Museum of Denmark) (current)
- 09:15, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . N File:Haste.jpg (Photo: Maritime Museum of Denmark) (current)
- 09:09, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+108) . . m Haste, Johan Henrik
- 07:39, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Hemert, Peter van 2
- 07:39, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+41) . . m Hemert, Peter van 2
- 07:07, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+133) . . m Bjørn, Andreas
- 06:58, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+108) . . m Fabritius de Tengnagel, Conrad Alexander
- 05:46, 11 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+160) . . m House of Fabritius & Wever (current)
- 08:19, 7 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+70) . . m Bjørn, Andreas
- 05:42, 7 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . m Bynck, Samuel
- 05:14, 7 January 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+146) . . m Bynck, Samuel
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)